Case Information: 60136 | |||
Short Caption: | ADAMS (DANIEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53373 , 64402 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C245166 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/26/2012 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/30/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
01/30/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 12-03174 | |
02/09/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 12-04379 | |
02/15/2012 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 2/1/2012. Response to Supreme Court Order dated 02/09/12. | 12-04971 | |
03/26/2012 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 1. | 12-09456 | |
03/26/2012 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 2. | 12-09457 | |
03/26/2012 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 3. | 12-09458 | |
03/26/2012 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 4. | 12-09459 | |
03/26/2012 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/29/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk - Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED). | ||
06/14/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Fn2[WE have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter. We conclude that appellant is only entitled to the relief described herein.] NNP12-NS/KP/JH | 12-18687 | |
07/10/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-21655 | |
07/10/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/25/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 19, 2012. | 12-21655 |