Case Information: 60105 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH (MELODY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 60104 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR110358 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
01/25/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.) | 12-02627 | |
01/31/2012 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Terry Jenkins/Peggy Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/22/11. | 12-03378 | |
03/06/2012 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 12, 2012. | 12-07082 | |
03/13/2012 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 12-07989 | |
03/13/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement with CD-ROM included. | 12-07990 | |
04/02/2012 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 12-10401 | |
04/23/2012 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief Filed. | ||
11/15/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP | 12-36203 | |
12/12/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-39105 | |
12/12/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/18/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 14, 2012. | 12-39105 |