Case Information: 61999 | |||
Short Caption: | REIGER (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49359 , 58986 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C226095 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/30/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
10/30/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 12-34257 | |
11/15/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP | 12-36322 | |
12/14/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-39589 | |
12/14/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
12/27/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 20, 2012. | 12-39589 |