judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUKE VS. SIMON

Case Information: 60123
Short Caption:DUKE VS. SIMONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33874 , 35270 , 35377 , 35389 , 36195 , 36716 , 42820 , 43337 , 46444 , 47144 , 48263 , 53705 , 57570
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A340508Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Cherry, Douglas, Hardesty, SaittaCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Chief Justice Pickering for Justice DouglasPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/27/2012Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis.
01/27/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 12-02927
02/09/2012Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. 12-04431
02/10/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. (David J. Mortensen, Esq. and Nathan D. Severson, Esq. as counsel for respondents Roger M. Simon, M.D., and Retina Consultants of Nevada). 12-04581
02/10/2012MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 12-04582
02/16/2012MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Strike. 12-05204
02/21/2012MotionFiled Appellants Request and Affidavit Re: Extension of Time Pursuant to EDCR 2.25 to Prepare and Submit Her Response to the Following Documents: 1) Countermotion to the Respondents Frivolous and Disingenuous "Motion to Dismiss" of Appellant's Notice of Appeal and 2) Prepare and Submit the Appellant's Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 12-05507
02/29/2012MotionFiled Proper Person CounterMotion to Strike Respondents' Fivolous Motion to Strike the Transcript "Portion" Re: Trial; and Appellant's Request for a Status Check Re: Submission of Her Reply, Case No. 57570, Filed August 30, 2011. 12-06502
03/12/2012MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Countermotion to Strike Respondents' Motion to Strike Appellant's Transcript Request. 12-07936
03/28/2012MotionFiled Notice of Appellant's Intent to File Reply to Respondents March 12, 2012 E-Filed Document, Under "Opposition..." 12-09834
04/12/2012MotionFiled Amended Notice of Appellant's Intent to File Reply to Respondents March 12, 2012 E-Filed Document, Under "Opposition...". 12-11789
05/25/2012MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 12-16604
06/05/2012MotionFiled Reply to Respondents' So-Called "Opposition", (E-Filed), March 12, 2012) In Re: Transcripts; and the Appellants Renewed Countermotion and her Affidavit, Requesting to Strike in its Entirety; as this is a Second Submission and to the Same Reply, (and in Case No. 57570) and is Improper; and also, a New Countermotion to Strike, "Motion to Dismiss", (E-Filed May 25, 2012) as this, the above and all of Their Other Bad Faith Actions, Abuses the Process and Obstructs Justice; and that Sanctions are in Order and Warranted. 12-17498
06/05/2012AppendixFiled Appendix 1 of 2; Exhibits 1 through 5. 12-17499
06/05/2012AppendixFiled Appendix 2 of 2; Exhibits 6 through 10. 12-17500
06/13/2012MotionFiled Opposition to Appellant's Countermotion to Strike Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. 12-18482
06/14/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Filing Objection to ATM&S Attorney Nathan Severson's Improper Action of Interference with, and his Continued Abuse of the Appellate Process. 12-18713
06/21/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Errata from Proper Person Anya Duke in regards to entering the wrong case No. in her "Notice of Intent to File Response/Reply to Respondents Opposition...". 12-19515
08/22/2012OtherJustice Michael A. Cherry disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties.
08/22/2012OtherJustice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties.
08/22/2012OtherJustice James W. Hardesty disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties.
08/22/2012OtherChief Justice Nancy M. Saitta disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties.
08/23/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Fn2[In light of this order, we deny all outstanding motions and other requests for relief as moot.] SNP12-MG/KP/RP 12-26640
09/17/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-29235
09/17/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
09/27/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 24, 2012. 12-29235
10/10/2012OtherReturned Unfiled proper person document entitiled, "Pro Se Appellant's Objection and Protest, and Affidavit, (re: Order of Appeal Dismissal, and Quick Issuance of Remittitur; and Immediate Action of Closing the Case on Post-Judgment Order, re: Costs and Fees) as the Evidence Submitted, (While being under this Court's Purview) was Tampered With, and Justice was Obstructed; thereby, Creating and Promoting, a Substantial Injustice; and, the Request to Vacate this Post-Judgment Order, and Rehear this Matter Again."