judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3746
B-3746
01/02/1973
Application for Writ of Error
MARGARET B. HALTOM, ET AL., ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF TEXAS AND THE TEXAS FINE ARTS ASSOCIATION
AUSTIN NATIONAL BANK, TRUSTEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/05/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/05/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/23/1973Amended PetitionPetitioner
01/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/02/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/05/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/05/1973Response to Petition
01/23/1973Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
01/23/1973Amended Petition
01/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Margaret B. Haltom, et al.Petitioner
Attorney General of the State of Texas and the Texas Fine Arts AssociationPetitioner
Austin National Bank, TrusteeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information