Case Information: 60107 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. DIST. CT. (MARSHALL) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 64814 , 68747 , 68747-COA , 70695 , 70695-COA , 73416 , 76678 , 82183 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C260523 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2012 | Filing Fee | Petition filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
01/25/2012 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus Or, In the Alternative, Prohibition. | 12-02643 | |
01/25/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ-Volume 1. | 12-02647 | |
01/25/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ-Volume 2. | 12-02648 | |
01/25/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay of District Court Order. | 12-02670 | |
01/26/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer. Real party in interest, on behald of respondents, shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, February 1, 2012, to file and serve an answer. We defer ruling on the motion for a stay. Fn1[All documents in this matter shall be filed personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.] | 12-02824 | |
01/30/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extention of Time to File Answer to the Petitioner's Writ of Mandanmus, or in the Alternative Prohibition by Real Party in Interest, Prentice Marshall, Pursuant to NRAP 26(b) | 12-03094 | |
01/30/2012 | Motion | Filed Answer to Petitioner's Request for Stay of "District Court Order" and Motion for Stay in Related District Court Case No. 10C266138 by Real Party in Interest, Prentice Marshall. | 12-03096 | |
02/01/2012 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Writ Petition. | 12-03455 | |
02/02/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant petitioner's motion for a stay in part. The motion for an extension of time to answer the petition is granted. Marshall shall have until 5:00 p.m. on February 8, 2012, to file and serve the answer. Fn2[All documents in this matter shall be filed personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.] | 12-03576 | |
02/09/2012 | Petition/Writ | Filed Real Party In Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Or In The Alternative, Prohibition. | 12-04340 | |
02/14/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate its decision to strike the amended notice of intent to seek the death penalty." | 12-04857 | |
02/14/2012 | Writ | Issued Writ with Letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Nancy A. Becker for service upon Judge Jessie Elizabeth Walsh. | 12-04919 | |
03/05/2012 | Writ | Filed Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Elizabeth Walsh on 02/29/12. | 12-06964 | |
03/12/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur | 12-07874 | |
03/12/2012 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |