judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3770
B-3770
01/08/1973
Application for Writ of Error
J. M. TINDALL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS DBA J.M. TINDALL GIN
THELMA RHODES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/30/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/24/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
01/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/02/1973Opinion issued
04/04/1973Response to Motion filed
03/30/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/21/1973Document received (See Remarks)
01/24/1973Response to Petition
01/08/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledDismissed
01/08/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thelma RhodesRespondent
J. M. Tindall, individually and as dba J.M. Tindall GinPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information