Case Information: 60116 | |||
Short Caption: | MORRIS (CHARLES) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34939 , 35030 , 44211 , 44983 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980900 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/23/2012 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/26/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
01/26/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 12-02828 | |
01/27/2012 | Other | Justice James W. Hardesty disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings | ||
01/30/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 12-03095 | |
02/08/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 12-04212 | |
02/27/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 12-06153 | |
02/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 12-06154 | |
03/16/2012 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 12-08483 | |
03/23/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | 12-09412 | |
03/23/2012 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | ||
11/15/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP | 12-36210 | |
12/12/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-39107 | |
12/12/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/18/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 14, 2012. | 12-39107 |