Case Information: 60115 | |||
Short Caption: | HADDOCK VS. DIST. CT. (FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP.) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A568250 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Justice Cherry for Chief Justice Pickering | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/26/2012 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from John G. Benedict. | ||
01/26/2012 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 12-02799 | |
01/26/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus-Volume 1. | 12-02848 | |
01/26/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus-Volume 2. | 12-02852 | |
01/26/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus-Volume 3. | 12-02853 | |
01/26/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus-Volume 4. | 12-02854 | |
03/30/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer. Answer due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days to file and serve any reply. | 12-10095 | |
04/30/2012 | Petition/Writ | Filed Real Party in Interest Federal Deposit Insurance Corp.'s Answering Brief to the Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. | 12-13611 | |
04/30/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ Vol 1. | 12-13612 | |
04/30/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ Vol 2. | 12-13615 | |
05/15/2012 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petitioners' Reply to Real Party in Interest Federal Deposit Insurance Corp.'s Answering Brief to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 12-15475 | |
05/15/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ Reply Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 12-15485 | |
05/15/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Petitioners' Reply to Real Party in Interest Federal Deposit Insurance Corp.'s Answering Brief to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Appendix. | 12-15490 | |
06/14/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP12-NS/KP/JH | 12-18775 | |
07/11/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur | 12-21829 | |
07/11/2012 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |