Case Information: 60109 | |||
Short Caption: | TELLIS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE C/W 60110 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 60109*, 60110 | Related Case(s): | 58400 , 63073 , 75665 , 75665-COA |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C264792 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
01/25/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 12-02679 | |
02/27/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeals. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." Nos. 60109/60110. | 12-06108 | |
03/23/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-09290 | |
03/23/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
04/03/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 29, 2012. | 12-09290 |