judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARDS (CARL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 61993
Short Caption:EDWARDS (CARL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C274602Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/30/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/30/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Fast track notice issued to trial counsel.) 12-34173
10/30/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. 12-34176
11/14/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 7/18/11; 4/30/12; 8/22/12; and 10/15/12. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt and Maria Garibay. Filed in district court on: November 13, 2012. 12-35971
12/10/2012MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Transcripts. 12-38700
12/11/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: January 24, 2013. 12-39027
12/11/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Transcripts. Court recorders Schmidt and Garibay's certificate due: 14 days. Fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached.] Fn2[If any of the named court reporters believe she is not responsible for filing and delivering the requested transcripts, she shall inform this court in writing within 7 days from the date of this order.] 12-39028
12/17/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/18/11. 12-39940
12/21/2012TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria L. Garibay stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/30/12; 8/22/12; and 10/15/12. 12-40489
01/23/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Fast Track Statement and Appendix) 13-02447
01/30/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: February 22, 2013. 13-03133
02/22/2013MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File FTS. 13-05708
02/28/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: March 25, 2013. 13-06229
03/22/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person document received on March 14, 2013. We conclude that appellant has failed to demonstrate that dismissal of counsel is warranted, and we deny the motion. Hereafter, appellant shall proceed by and through his counsel of record. 13-08616
03/22/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Motion (Petition for Appointment of Counsel). 13-07838
03/26/2013MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement. (30 days) 13-08871
03/28/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 24, 2013. 13-09226
04/12/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person motion received on April 5, 2013. Because appellant has failed to demonstrate that dismissal of his counsel is warranted, we deny the motion for reconsideration. Appellant shall address his concerns with his counsel of record. 13-10832
04/12/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Return Original Documents Filed, and for Further Declaratory Relief NRS 8.09 and Notice of Appeal Docket #2. 13-10043
04/24/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 13-12072
04/24/2013AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement -Appellant's Appendix. 13-12073
05/08/2013Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 13-13470
05/14/2013Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED).
05/23/2013Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document (Compliant regarding Attorney). 13-15258
06/03/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person. Appellant shall proceed by and through his counsel of record. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, any future proper person documents submitted in this appeal. 13-16131
06/06/2013Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief Filed.
07/22/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP13- JH/RP/MC. 13-21406
08/16/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 13-24207
08/16/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
08/30/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 23, 2013. 13-24207