judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JAMES STEWART COMPANY, INCORPORATED, GRAND PRAIRIE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY v. JOHN S. LAW, ET AL.

Case: A-2693
A-2693
05/08/1950
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES STEWART COMPANY, INCORPORATED, GRAND PRAIRIE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
JOHN S. LAW, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/08/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/08/1950Response to Reply filedRespondent
06/07/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
06/06/1950Response to Reply filedRespondent
05/26/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/20/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/18/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/23/1950Response to Motion filed
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/08/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/25/1950Dissenting opinion issued.
10/25/1950Opinion issued
06/08/1950Response to Reply filed
06/07/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/07/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/06/1950Response to Reply filed
05/26/1950Reply to Response
05/20/1950Reply to Response
05/18/1950Response to Petition
05/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/08/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grand Prairie Construction CompanyPetitioner
John S. Law, et al.Respondent
James Stewart Company, IncorporatedPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information