judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAM RIGGS FLYING SERVICE VS. HEYING

Case Information: 38218
Short Caption:SAM RIGGS FLYING SERVICE VS. HEYINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A413146Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/30/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Chad M. Golightly, Ltd.--check no. 8632
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12459
08/30/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14942
09/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15685
09/19/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
11/08/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. The Settlement Judge does not believe Henry Brandon Wright is a proper party Respondent; the Settlement Judge recommends the caption be modified accordingly. 01-18691
12/03/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-20239
12/13/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Removed Henry Brandon Wright as respondent and Bader & Ryan as counsel for Wright.
12/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 01-21174
12/17/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.