judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CYNTHIA ANN BARRETT, a/k/a CYNTHIA A. BARRETT v. HAROLD MUSSER, Conservator of The Estate of Robert Musser

Case Heading (S-08-0086)
Case Number:S-08-0086Case Docketed On:04/17/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law
Short Title:CYNTHIA ANN BARRETT, a/k/a CYNTHIA A. BARRETT v. HAROLD MUSSER, Conservator of The Estate of Robert Musser
Full Title:CYNTHIA ANN BARRETT, a/k/a CYNTHIA A. BARRETT, Appellant (Defendant), v. HAROLD MUSSER, Conservator of The Estate of Robert Musser, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCynthia Ann BarrettRonald P. Jurovich
AppelleeHarold MusserWeston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/17/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/17/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/29/2008Brief - Appellant and received copy of designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
07/16/2008Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
07/17/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel that case has been settled and motion for dismissal will be filed.EventPhone CallFinal
07/21/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel for the appellant. Received copies of stipulated notice of dismissal in today's mail. Called counsel to advise the this need to be e-filed; staff member said that she would pass that message on to Mr. JurovichEventPhone CallFinal
07/22/2008Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
07/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received (received before e-filing, counsel notified of requirement to e-file, held until e-filing received and filed).EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
07/22/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal