judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELMER A. OSORTO V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1249
Short Caption:ELMER A. OSORTO V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL1082-05Filed Date:10/05/2010

Opening Event Date:10/05/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/20/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElmer A. Osorto YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Magdalena AcevedoYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David Reiter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/21/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Reiter, Esquire
11/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/11/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (18pgs/Tape) 4/3/09 proc.
08/11/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (73pgs/Richer) 5/1/09 proc.
08/11/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (46pgs/Burr) 5/15/09 proc.
08/11/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #4 (91pgs/Armstrong) 6/11/09 proc.
08/11/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #5 (204pgs/Armstrong) 6/12/09 proc. w/CD
08/11/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/17/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until November 30, 2011 (Appellee)Granted
11/07/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until November 30, 2011
11/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/30/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/14/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/06/2012FiledRecord Copies
01/06/2012FiledRecord Index
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/20/2012FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Easterly,Belson
04/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
05/04/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
05/18/2012FiledMandate