judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AHMAD SOULEIMAN MINES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1248
Short Caption:AHMAD SOULEIMAN MINES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD9756-10Filed Date:10/05/2010

Opening Event Date:10/05/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAhmad Souleiman Mines Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Montrell Scaife, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/21/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Montrell Scaife, Esquire
11/09/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
11/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (124pgs/Tape) 9/24/10 proc. w/CD
11/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/02/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 14, 2011 (unopposed)
01/14/2011RECEIVED- aplt's brief (no appendix)
01/21/2011ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief of appellant is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date the limited appendix is filed with this court. (By: JAC)
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/02/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX (no oppo).
02/02/2011RECEIVED Appendix to Appellant's Brief.
02/15/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged limited appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
02/15/2011APPENDIX
03/17/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/21/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief
05/05/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
05/05/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is AFFIRMED. (BROBST)
05/31/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
06/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED