judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NITELIFE, INC. VS. WORLDNET INVESTMENT CORP.

Case Information: 38217
Short Caption:NITELIFE, INC. VS. WORLDNET INVESTMENT CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A426624Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12447
07/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
07/30/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Robert B. Goicoechea. His name was mistakenly shown in district court documents as counsel of record, but he is not involved in this case in any way. (Removed Goicoechea as counsel of record.) 01-12871
08/06/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Andre Bohbot. This matter was docketed in the Nevada Supreme Court by mistake. 08/13/01 ORDER: RETURNED UNFILED. 01-13223
08/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. It appears that appellants improperly filed the notice of appeal in the district court rather than in the justice's court and therefore the notice of appeal was erroneously transmitted to this court. The clerk of this court shall administratively close the appeal in Docket No. 38217 and return appellants' filing fee. On August 6, 2001, appellant Andre Bohbot submitted a proper person "Notice to Dismiss and Transfer the Case to the Proper Court." Because we administratively close this appeal, we direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, Mr. Bohbot's August 6, 2001, notice. 01-13682
08/13/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Sam J. Ramzi. Returned Check No. 1982 , dated 07/25/01, in the amount of $200.00.
08/13/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Andre Bohbot. Returned unfiled, the original Notice to Dismiss and Transfer the Case to the Proper Court, received on August 6, 2001.
08/13/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. Administratively Closed. No remittitur issued.