judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN D. ADAMSON v. WILLARD M. WOODS and CYNTHIA S. WOODS

Case Heading (S-08-0085)
Case Number:S-08-0085Case Docketed On:04/16/2008
Linked To: S-08-0078
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:JOHN D. ADAMSON v. WILLARD M. WOODS and CYNTHIA S. WOODS
Full Title:JOHN D. ADAMSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. WILLARD M. WOODS and CYNTHIA S. WOODS, Appellees, (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn D. Adamson Pro Se
AppelleeWillard M. WoodsFrank J. Jones
AppelleeCynthia S. WoodsFrank J. Jones

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real, Taxation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 29A
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/16/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/16/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/16/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/02/2008Brief - Appellant (Designation of record returned to appellant for filing in the District Court)BriefAppellantFinal
07/11/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/17/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/28/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/30/2008Order - Consolidating cases (with S-08-0078)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/30/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/30/2008Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk, no additional designation of record filedEventPhone CallFinal
03/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Jusice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/06/2009Correspondence - Outgoing. Sent letter to counsel regarding email communication to court.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
03/18/2009Petition - ClarificationPetitionClarificationFinal
04/02/2009Order - Deny - Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Order Amending OpinionOrderDenyFinal
04/02/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding amended opinion, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/02/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/02/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/06/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
04/20/2009Event - Rejected Filing - received motion for costs from Mr. Adamson. Returned without filing with letter advising that costs were awarded in the mandate and he may submit directly to opposing counsel.EventRejected FilingFinal