judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8571
B-8571
06/20/1979
Application for Writ of Error
GULF INSURANCE COMPANY
MRS. MINNIE O. BOBO AND MARY LAMBERT, COMMERCIAL STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/28/1980Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/21/1979Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
09/14/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/11/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/29/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
06/20/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/10/1980Response to Motion filed
02/28/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/20/1980Opinion issued
09/25/1979Document received (See Remarks)
09/25/1979Document received (See Remarks)
09/25/1979Document received (See Remarks)
09/21/1979Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
09/14/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/11/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/03/1979Letter Filed
06/29/1979Response to Petition
06/20/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/20/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Commercial Standard Insurance CompanyRespondent
Mrs. Minnie O. Bobo and Mary LambertRespondent
Texas Automobile Insurance Service OfficeAmicus Curiae
Gulf Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Association of Fire and Casualty Companies of TexasAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information