judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8575
B-8575
06/21/1979
Application for Writ of Error
CROWN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
BILLIE DARLENE FREEMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/26/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/16/1979Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/06/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
06/21/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/01/1979Response to Motion filed
09/26/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/16/1979Reply to Response
07/06/1979Response to Petition
06/21/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/21/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Billie Darlene FreemanRespondent
CROWN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information