judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8584
B-8584
06/22/1979
MISC PETITION
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
ENTEX, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/29/1980Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/25/1980Letter brief
04/24/1980Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/22/1980Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/17/1980Motion for Rehearing
10/22/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/17/1979Appellees' Brief filed
07/23/1979Appellant's Brief filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/29/1980Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/25/1980Letter brief
04/24/1980Response to Motion filed
04/24/1980Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/22/1980Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/17/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/02/1980Dissenting opinion issued.
04/02/1980Opinion issued
10/22/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/17/1979Appellees' Brief filed
07/23/1979Appellant's Brief filed
06/22/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/22/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/22/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/22/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/22/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/22/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/22/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/22/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Houston Natural Gas CorporationAmicus Curiae
LONE STAR GAS COMPANYAmicus Curiae
Entex, Inc.Appellee
Pioneer Natural Gas CompanyAmicus Curiae
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Appellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information