judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8594
B-8594
06/26/1979
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF DALLAS, TX
BETTY JEAN CROSS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/26/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/16/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
06/26/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/01/1979Response to Motion filed
09/26/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/16/1979Response to Petition
07/09/1979Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
06/26/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/26/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Betty Jean CrossRespondent
City of Dallas, TXPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information