State V James Chadwell | § § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B | Male White 5' 7", 165 lbs | |||
264 W 9TH ST PERU, IN 46970 | |||||
Probation Department | Miami County Probation Department | ||||
25 Court Street Peru, IN 46970 | |||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics
| |||
Charges: Chadwell, James B | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | OPERATING A VEHICLE WITH AN ACE OF .15 OR MORE- | 99999 | 9-30-5-1(b) | Misdemeanor Class A | 07/16/2016 |
2. | OPERATING A VEHICLE WHILE INTOXICATED ENDANGERING A PERSON- First Offense But Where A Person Was En | 000084924953 | 9-30-5-2(a) & (b) | Misdemeanor Class A | 07/16/2016 |
Bonds | |||||||||||||||||||
|
07/28/2016 | Converted Event docket level comment: $300.00 CASH BOND | |||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/28/2016 | Converted Event Docket Note: PROB | |||||||||||||
07/29/2016 | Converted Event Information filed 7/28/16. Ticket issued. Defendant was released 7/16/16 on $300.00 cash bond to appear for Initial Hearing on Tuesday,August 2, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/29/2016 | |||||||||||||
08/02/2016 | Converted Event Calendar: INITIAL HEARING (Time: 16:00:00) (Judge: D01) | |||||||||||||
08/02/2016 | Converted Event DEefendant appears. State appears by counsel. Defendant is advised of rights. Not guilty plea entered. Cause set for pre-trial on September 14, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. and trial on September 27, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. Notice ordered. lcd (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 08/02/2016 | |||||||||||||
09/14/2016 | Converted Event Calendar: INFORMAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (Time: 08:30:00) (Judge: D01) Hearing Code: (D) | |||||||||||||
09/14/2016 | Converted Event Pretrial held. Defendant to request public defender at trial date on 9-27-16. tdb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/14/2016 | |||||||||||||
09/26/2016 | Converted Event Derick W Steele enters his Appearance on behalf of the Defendant, together with Certificate of Service. dlm (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/26/2016 | |||||||||||||
09/26/2016 | Converted Event Defendant, by counsel, files Motion for Continuance, together with Certificate of Service. dlm (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/26/2016 | |||||||||||||
09/27/2016 | Converted Event Calendar: TRIAL (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: D01) Hearing Code: (D) | |||||||||||||
09/28/2016 | Converted Event 9/26/16, Comes now the Court and Grants motion for continuance and resets pretrial for November 16, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. and trial for November 29, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. Notice issued. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/28/2016 | |||||||||||||
09/28/2016 | Converted Event State of Indiana, by Bruce Embrey, files State's Answer to Discovery and Request for Discovery, together with Certificate of Service. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/28/2016 | |||||||||||||
11/16/2016 | Converted Event Calendar: INFORMAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (Time: 08:30:00) (Judge: D01) | |||||||||||||
11/16/2016 | Converted Event Pre-trial held. Plea to be taken on trial date of 11/29/16. dlm (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 11/16/2016 | |||||||||||||
11/21/2016 | Converted Event Defendant, by counsel, files Motion for Continuance, together with Certificate of Service. dlm (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 11/21/2016 | |||||||||||||
11/21/2016 | Converted Event Court grants Motion to Continue. Hearing set for November 29, 2016 is now continued to January 3, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. Notice ordered. (11/21/16) dlm (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 11/21/2016 | |||||||||||||
11/29/2016 | Converted Event Calendar: TRIAL (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: D01) Hearing Code: (D) | |||||||||||||
01/03/2017 | Converted Event Calendar: TRIAL (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: D01) Hearing Code: (D) | |||||||||||||
01/04/2017 | Converted Event 1/3/17, Defendant by counsel, files Verified Motion for continuance, together with Certificate of Service. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 01/04/2017 | |||||||||||||
01/04/2017 | Converted Event 1/3/17, Comes now the Court and Grants motion for continuance and resets this matter for February 7, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. Notice issued. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 01/04/2017 | |||||||||||||
02/06/2017 | Converted Event Defendant, by counsel, files Motion for Continuance, together with Certificate of Service. dlm (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/06/2017 | |||||||||||||
02/07/2017 | Converted Event Calendar: TRIAL (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: D01) Hearing Code: (D) | |||||||||||||
02/07/2017 | Converted Event 2/6/17, Comes now the Court and Grants Motion for continuance and resets this matter for February 28, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. Notice issued. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/07/2017 | |||||||||||||
02/28/2017 | Converted Event Calendar: TRIAL (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: D01) | |||||||||||||
02/28/2017 | Converted Event On motion of defendant the Court now continues this matter to April 11, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. Notice ordered. lcd (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/28/2017 | |||||||||||||
04/11/2017 | Converted Event Calendar: TRIAL (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: D01) | |||||||||||||
04/11/2017 | Converted Event On motion of defendant the Court now continues this matter to April 18, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. Notice ordered. lcd (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/11/2017 | |||||||||||||
04/18/2017 | Converted Event Calendar: TRIAL (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: D01) | |||||||||||||
04/18/2017 | Judgment 1. OPERATING A VEHICLE WITH AN ACE OF .15 OR MORE- Finding of Guilty | |||||||||||||
04/18/2017 | Judgment 2. OPERATING A VEHICLE WHILE INTOXICATED ENDANGERING A PERSON- First Offense But Where A Person Was En Dismissed | |||||||||||||
04/19/2017 | Converted Event 4/18/17, State of Indiana, by Jeffrey Sinkovics and Defendant, by counsel, files Recommendation of plea agreement. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/19/2017 | |||||||||||||
04/20/2017 | Converted Event 4/18/17, State appears by Bruce Embrey. Defendant appears with consel, Derick Steele. Plea agreement accepted. Court finds defendant guilty of Count I and sentences him to the Miami Co jail for one year. The Court now suspends said sentence, except for four days with good time credit and credit for two actual days served, and places defendant on probation for the balance of the sentence. Defendant evaluated. Deefendant is ordered to successfully complete his currrent alcohol treatment. Court finds defendant $350 plus $200 CMF and $183.50 CC. THe Court will suspend any portion of the fine that is used as costs in the evaluation. Court orders defendant's driver's license suspended for the period of 90 days, retroactive the to the BMV suspension. Admin fee $50/PSF $50 initial and $20 each month thereafter while on probation. On motion of the State the Court now orders Count II dismissed. Bond to fine and costs. Fine and costs to be paid within 60 days. alr (DISPOSED: GP ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/20/2017 | |||||||||||||
04/20/2017 | Converted Event SR16 transferred Electronically to the BMV as of this date. jf (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/20/2017 | |||||||||||||
04/20/2017 | Converted Event SR16 transferred Electronically to the BMV as of this date. jf (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/20/2017 | |||||||||||||
06/01/2017 | Converted Event 5/31/17, Defendant, pro se, files Petition for extension of time to pay CC and Fine. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/01/2017 | |||||||||||||
06/02/2017 | Converted Event 6/1/17, Comes now the Court and Grants Petition for extension of time to pay CC and Fine an additional 90 days. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/02/2017 | |||||||||||||
03/22/2018 | Converted Event 3/21/18, Defendant, pro se, files Petition to Extend Probation, together with Certificate of service. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 03/22/2018 | |||||||||||||
03/26/2018 | Converted Event Comes now the Court and Grants Petition to extend probation an additional six months from the original termination date of 4/14/18. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 03/26/2018 | |||||||||||||
07/27/2018 | Converted Event Late fee added to court costs. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/27/2018 | |||||||||||||
09/04/2018 | Converted Event 8/31/18, Probation Department, files Petition to Modify or revoke probation. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/04/2018 | |||||||||||||
09/14/2018 | Converted Event Probation Department files Notice of Probation Violation. Defendant ordered to appear on 9/25/18 at 3:30 p.m. Service by Sheriff. alr (SHERIFF RTN SERVED COPY MAILED 9/25/18) alr 9/27/18 (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/14/2018 | |||||||||||||
09/25/2018 | Converted Event Calendar: PROBATION VIOLATION (Time: 15:30:00) (Judge: D01) | |||||||||||||
09/25/2018 | Converted Event Derick W Steele files Motion to Withdraw Appearance, together with Certificate of Service. dlm (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/25/2018 | |||||||||||||
09/25/2018 | Converted Event Defendant appears. State appears by counsel. Defendant is advised of rights. Denial entered. Cause set for status hearing on December 4, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Notice ordered. lcd (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/25/2018 | |||||||||||||
09/26/2018 | Converted Event 9/25/18, Comes now the Court and Grants Motion to withdraw Derick Steele's appearance. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/26/2018 | |||||||||||||
10/03/2018 | Converted Event 10/2/18, Probation Department, files 1st Amended Petition to Modify or Revoke Probation. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 10/03/2018 | |||||||||||||
10/05/2018 | Converted Event Probation Department files Notice of Probation Violation. Defendant ordered to appear on 10/30/18 at 3:30 p.m. Service by Sheriff. alr (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 10/05/2018 | |||||||||||||
10/11/2018 | Converted Event 10/10/18, State of Indiana, by Bruce Embrey, files Motion for continuance, together with Certificate of service. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 10/11/2018 | |||||||||||||
10/19/2018 | Converted Event 10/18/18, Comes now the Court and Grants Motion to continue and resets this matter for January 15, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 10/19/2018 | |||||||||||||
10/30/2018 | Converted Event Calendar: PROBATION VIOLATION (Time: 15:30:00) (Judge: D01) | |||||||||||||
10/30/2018 | Converted Event Defendant appears. State appears by counsel. Defendant is advised of righ ts. Denial entered. Cause set fo fact finidng hearing on January 15, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Notice ordered. lcd (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 10/30/2018 | |||||||||||||
12/26/2018 | Service Returned Served Served in door/mail 10/15/18 | |||||||||||||
01/15/2019 | Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) STATUS HEARING (ST) | |||||||||||||
01/15/2019 | Fact Finding Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) FACT-FINDING HEARING (FF) | |||||||||||||
01/24/2019 | Disposition on Violation/Noncompliance (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David) 1. OPERATING A VEHICLE WITH AN ACE OF .15 OR MORE-
| |||||||||||||
01/25/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Disposition on Violation/Noncompliance ---- 1/24/2019 : James B Chadwell | |||||||||||||
01/25/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Disposition on Violation/Noncompliance ---- 1/24/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
03/28/2019 | Motion to Modify Probation Filed Petition to modify or revoke probation
| |||||||||||||
03/28/2019 | Notice of Violation of Probation
| |||||||||||||
04/03/2019 | Order for Hearing Court sets hearing for probation violation on 4/16/19 at 3:30 p.m. Service by Sheriff.
| |||||||||||||
04/17/2019 | Hearing Journal Entry Due to this hearing not being calendared the Court continues this matter to May 14, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. lcd
| |||||||||||||
04/17/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Initial Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 at 3:30 PM. | |||||||||||||
04/18/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 4/17/2019 : James B Chadwell Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 4/17/2019 : James B Chadwell | |||||||||||||
04/18/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 4/17/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 4/17/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
04/18/2019 | Service Returned Served Served/Copy and Copy Mailed | |||||||||||||
05/14/2019 | Initial Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | |||||||||||||
05/15/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 3:30 PM. | |||||||||||||
05/16/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 5/15/2019 : James B Chadwell | |||||||||||||
05/16/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 5/15/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
05/17/2019 | Order of Rule to Show Cause Defendant to appear for show cause hearing on 6/18/19 at 3:30 p.m. Service by Sheriff.
| |||||||||||||
05/30/2019 | Service Returned Served Sheriff rtn served copy and copy mailed.
| |||||||||||||
06/06/2019 | Notice of Violation of Probation J. Chadwell Notice of PV
| |||||||||||||
06/06/2019 | Motion to Modify Probation Filed J. chadwell Petition to Revoke
| |||||||||||||
06/07/2019 | Order for Hearing Court sets hearing for probation violation on 6/18/19 at 3:30 p.m. Service by Sheriff.
| |||||||||||||
06/07/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing on Violation of Probation scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 3:30 PM. | |||||||||||||
06/08/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 6/7/2019 : James B Chadwell | |||||||||||||
06/08/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 6/7/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
06/17/2019 | Service Returned Served Sheriff rtn served copy and mailed
| |||||||||||||
06/18/2019 | Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) Order to Show Cause | |||||||||||||
06/18/2019 | Hearing on Violation of Probation (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | |||||||||||||
06/20/2019 | Order Issuing Warrant for Arrest Bond set at $600 cash only. Warrant to expire after 180 days.
| |||||||||||||
06/20/2019 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Issued | |||||||||||||
09/24/2019 | Hearing (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | |||||||||||||
09/24/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 at 8:45 AM. | |||||||||||||
09/24/2019 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Served | |||||||||||||
09/25/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 9/24/2019 : James B Chadwell | |||||||||||||
09/25/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 9/24/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
09/26/2019 | Personal Recognizance Bond Entered in Clerk's Office | |||||||||||||
10/01/2019 | Amended Disposition on Violation/Noncompliance (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David) Reason: Revocation of Probation 1. OPERATING A VEHICLE WITH AN ACE OF .15 OR MORE-
| |||||||||||||
10/02/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Disposition on Violation/Noncompliance ---- 10/1/2019 : James B Chadwell | |||||||||||||
10/02/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Disposition on Violation/Noncompliance ---- 10/1/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
10/03/2019 | Order Issued
| |||||||||||||
10/04/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 10/3/2019 : James B Chadwell | |||||||||||||
10/04/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 10/3/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
10/17/2019 | First Class Mail Returned No Mail Receptacle 10/12/19
| |||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Disposition Sent Electronically to Indiana State Police Added By CHRIS Interface (SNTC) | |||||||||||||
11/19/2019 | Notice of Violation of Probation j. chadwell notice of PV
| |||||||||||||
11/19/2019 | Motion to Modify Probation Filed j. chadwell petition to revoke
| |||||||||||||
11/22/2019 | Order Issued Court orders warrant for probation violation.
| |||||||||||||
11/22/2019 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Issued | |||||||||||||
11/25/2019 | Change of Address Filed J. Chadwell address change
| |||||||||||||
11/27/2019 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Served | |||||||||||||
01/13/2020 | Notice of Violation of Probation j. chadwell notice PV
| |||||||||||||
01/13/2020 | Motion to Modify Probation Filed j. chadwell petition
| |||||||||||||
01/16/2020 | Order Issued Court orders warrant for Probation Violation.
| |||||||||||||
01/16/2020 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Issued | |||||||||||||
01/17/2020 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Served | |||||||||||||
01/21/2020 | Hearing on Violation of Probation (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) 1st Amended | |||||||||||||
01/21/2020 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing on Violation of Probation scheduled for 01/21/2020 at 8:45 AM. | |||||||||||||
01/21/2020 | Indigent Counsel Appointed at County Expense | |||||||||||||
01/21/2020 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David ) Defendant appears. State appears by counsel. Defendant is advised of rights and requests counsel. Public Defender appointed. Denial entered. Cause set for fact finding hearing on February 11, 2020 at 9:00 a.m.
| |||||||||||||
01/21/2020 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Fact Finding Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2020 at 9:00 AM. | |||||||||||||
01/22/2020 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 1/21/2020 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Journal Entry ---- 1/21/2020 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 1/21/2020 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
01/23/2020 | Appearance Filed Appearance
| |||||||||||||
01/23/2020 | Discovery Filed Discovery Sheet
| |||||||||||||
02/11/2020 | Fact Finding Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | |||||||||||||
02/11/2020 | Order Granting Mot. to Enter Plea Pursuant to Plea Agreement (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David ) Order Granting Motion to Enter Plea of Guilty Pursuant to Plea Agreement.
| |||||||||||||
02/12/2020 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Mot. to Enter Plea Pursuant to Plea Agreement ---- 2/11/2020 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
02/18/2020 | Order on Hearing Court orders the pending Probation Violation dismissed. Probation terminated unsuccessfully.
| |||||||||||||
02/19/2020 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order on Hearing ---- 2/18/2020 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
52D01-1607-CM-000250 | Chadwell, James B | 07/28/2016 Miami Superior Court 1 | CM - Criminal Misdemeanor Decided |
|