judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAMIEN D. MARTIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1303
Short Caption:DAMIEN D. MARTIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD12470-10Filed Date:10/20/2010

Opening Event Date:10/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/28/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/03/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDamien D. Martin Y
Dennis M. HartYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/01/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Dennis Hart, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/01/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Dennis Hart, Esquire
11/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (122pgs/Tape) 9/20/10 proc. w/CD
11/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/02/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/02/2010RECORD INDEX
12/02/2010RECORD COPIES
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Request for judicial action report filed 8/10/10)******SEALED
12/02/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcript
01/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo).
01/13/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Brief.
01/13/2011RECEIVED - limited appendix
01/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/21/2011APPENDIX
02/22/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/22/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/28/2011SUBMITTED to Glickman,Fisher,Schwelb.
07/11/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
08/03/2011FiledMandate