judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: W. STUART BATTLE, APLT

Case Information: 10-SP-1304
Short Caption:IN RE: W. STUART BATTLE, APLTClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Other Special Proceedings
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CNC526-08Filed Date:10/20/2010

Opening Event Date:10/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/02/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantW. Stuart Battle N
Bernard S. GrimmNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/02/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
11/16/2010RECORD INDEX
11/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/01/2010 On consideration of the NOA taken from the 10/14/10 order that denied appellant's motion to refund the fine paid pursuant to a conviction that had been vacated and it appearing that while the appeal was pending...Judge Holeman issued an order on 11/23/10 purporting to vacate the order on appeal and grant appellant's motion for refund, it is ORDERED that this court will CONSTRUE Judge Holeman's action as an indication of his intent to grant relief to appellant...and this APPEAL IS REMANDED TO SUPERIOR COURT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the trial court shall re-enter the 11/23/10 order once jurisdiction has been transferred to that court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the CLERK SHALL ISSUE THE MANDATTE FORTHWITH.
12/02/2010MANDATE ISSUED
12/09/2010RECEIVED - order frm Judge Holeman resubmitting trial court memorandum order dated 11/23/10 for filing
04/17/2014FiledArchived