judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LARRY WAGNER v. ALLEN REUTER and CONNIE REUTER

Case Heading (S-08-0142)
Case Number:S-08-0142Case Docketed On:07/02/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:LARRY WAGNER v. ALLEN REUTER and CONNIE REUTER
Full Title:LARRY WAGNER, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ALLEN REUTER and CONNIE REUTER, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLarry WagnerDavid Michael Clark
AppelleeAllen ReuterMary Helen Reed
AppelleeConnie ReuterMary Helen Reed

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property - Personal
Opinion Number:2009 WY 75
Citation:208 P.3d 1317

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/02/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/02/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/19/2008Brief - Appellant (electronic file stamp indicates filed on 8/18/08, however it was submitted after 5pm and considered filed on 8/19/08.BriefAppellantFinal
10/02/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellees and received copy of designated record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mary Helen Reed for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David M. Clark for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/29/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David M. Clark for appellant; Mary Helen Reed for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/08/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/29/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 6/26/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal