judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LONGO (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33443
Short Caption:LONGO (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982200Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/09/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/09/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00308
12/18/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 98-00436
12/18/1998AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 98-00437
12/31/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 98-00578
01/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter R. Walker is directed to deliver a copy of the requested rough draft transcript to the clerk of this court within 15 days of the date of this order. 99-00497
02/02/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 09/30/98 and 11/04/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker 99-00714
04/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. Judgment: " . . . we remand this case to the district court with instructions to vacate appellant's sentence and hold a new sentencing hearing before a different district court judge." We further order the Washoe County district Attorney to perform the plea bargan agreement specificially. Upon remand, if the sentencing judge pronounces a sentence that exceeds the sentence imposed by Judge Elliott, said sentence shall be automatically reduced to conform with Judge Elliott's lesser sentence. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-02987
05/12/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-03838
05/12/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 18, 1999. 99-03838