judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE MEBANE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1269
Short Caption:GEORGE MEBANE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD11874-10Filed Date:10/12/2010

Opening Event Date:10/12/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/27/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/21/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeorge Mebane Y
Ubong E. AkpanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ubong Akpan, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/26/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ubong Akpan, Esquire
11/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (104pgs/Tape) 9/13/10 proc. w/CD
12/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/23/2010RECORD INDEX
12/23/2010RECORD COPIES
12/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Pretrial Services filed 7/1/10 ****SEALED****
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (unopposed)
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 18, 2011.(By: JAC)
02/17/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/17/2011APPENDIX
03/24/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/24/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/20/2011FiledMotion - for leave to file motion for oral argument out of time (Appellant)
09/20/2011LodgedMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for oral argument.
09/27/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Fisher, Steadman
09/29/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge)
10/21/2011FiledMandate
11/08/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)