judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN EMMANUEL THOMAS, Deceased: MARGARET DICKSON v. KRIS THOMAS

Case Heading (S-08-0109)
Case Number:S-08-0109Case Docketed On:05/23/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN EMMANUEL THOMAS, Deceased: MARGARET DICKSON v. KRIS THOMAS
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN EMMANUEL THOMAS, Deceased: MARGARET DICKSON, Appellant (Respondent), v. KRIS THOMAS, Personal Representative of the Estate of John Emmanuel Thomas, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMargaret DicksonWilliam L. Hiser
AppelleeKris ThomasRussell Rauchfuss

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2009 WY 10
Citation:199 P.3d 1090

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/23/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/23/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/30/2008Event - Phone Call - received callf rom Mr. Rauchfuss, counsel for appellee, indicating that he did not have an opportunity to respond to the Rule 3.03 statement of evidence before case docketed. It appears that the district court did not follow the procedure in 3.03. He will file some type of motion regarding the record.EventPhone CallFinal
07/08/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/21/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/27/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/29/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/05/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/09/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/29/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/17/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/20/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/19/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal