judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SVETLANA KOZLOVSKA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1268
Short Caption:SVETLANA KOZLOVSKA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD11962-10Filed Date:10/12/2010

Opening Event Date:10/12/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/23/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSvetlana Kozlovska Y
Anna B. ScanlonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Anna Scanlon, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/26/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Anna Scanlon, Esquire
11/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
11/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (101pgs/Tape) 9/9/10 proc. w/CD
11/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/02/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (31 pgs/Tape - 9/9/10 proc. missing portion of SR#1) (w/CD)
01/11/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/11/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
02/15/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/17/11.
03/03/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 17, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/15/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/15/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
04/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (no oppo)
04/14/2011RECEIVED - aplt's reply brief
05/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged reply brief is filed. (By: JAC)
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/23/2011FiledSubmitted To Ruiz,Oberly,King
11/03/2011FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Oberly, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and King, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment on appeal is affirmed.)
11/28/2011FiledMandate