judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00200-CR
11-89-00200-CR
07/11/1989
Probation Revocation
Henry, Mark Perry
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/1997Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/1997Record checked out
09/15/1997Miscellaneous motion filed
02/25/1997Record checked in
02/11/1997Inquiring on status, etc. of case
12/31/1996Yearly opinion book
10/24/1996Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1996Record checked out
10/10/1996Miscellaneous motion filed
12/29/1989Mandate issued
11/09/1989Opinion issued
11/09/1989Opinion issued
11/09/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/02/1989Submitted
10/02/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/29/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Henry, Mark PerryCriminal - AppellantRandy Schaffer
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
Honorable Mary E. Bacon, Judge
484,850
60 yrs. TDC