judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00221-CV
11-89-00221-CV
07/11/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Burleson, Julian
Demontrond Buick
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/11/1990Mandate issued
10/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission set in Eastland
05/21/1990Letter filed from . . .
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
08/04/1989We send letter to lawyers, etc.
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/11/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Burleson, JulianAppellantKerry G. Fellows
Demondrond BuickAppelleeJohn O. Walters
Trial Court Information
County Civil Court at Law No. 2
Harris
Honorable Tom Sullivan
455596