judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00220-CR
11-89-00220-CR
07/11/1989
Theft
Acosta, Tara Serena
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/31/1990Mandate issued
06/14/1990Opinion issued
06/14/1990Opinion issued
06/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission set in Eastland
04/02/1990Letter filed from . . .
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
180th District Court
Harris
Honorable Patricia Rae Lykos
495,693
7.5 yrs. TDC