judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00201-CR
11-89-00201-CR
07/11/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
More, Don Khan
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/01/1990Mandate issued
02/01/1990Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedOverruled
01/29/1990Mot. - Ext. to file brief
01/18/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedMotion dismissed as moot
01/18/1990Mot. - To file disposedOverruled
01/18/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposed
01/15/1990Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article
01/04/1990Motion for rehearing received - not filed
12/14/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1989Submitted
12/14/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/01/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable Lloyd Douglas Shaver
511,290
life + $10,000 fine