judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1003-89
PD-1003-89
07/11/1989
PDR Case Type
HARRISON, EDWARD CHARLES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/06/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/11/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/11/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harrison, Edward CharlesApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Kenneth W. Smith
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00795-CR
Aff 6-8-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable Wallace C. Moore
497463