judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1002-89
PD-1002-89
07/11/1989
PDR Case Type
WALLACE, SCOTT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/06/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/11/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/11/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
WALLACE, SCOTTApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Kevin J. Clancy
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00438-CR
Aff 4-28-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable RON CHAPMAN
F86-81532-KH