judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00223-CV
11-89-00223-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
In re S.S.M., a Child (Texas Attorney General, Jim Mattox)
(McCullough, Jerry)
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/1990Mandate issued
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Attorney GeneralAppellantFrederick A. Krasny
Mccullough, JerryAppelleeJerry Mccullough
Trial Court Information
311th District Court
Harris
Honorable William Ralph Elliott
88-03465