judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1005-89
PD-1005-89
07/11/1989
PDR Case Type
FOWLER, JEFFREY LYNN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/06/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/11/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/11/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
FOWLER, JEFFREY LYNNApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01064-CR
Aff 6-1-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
194th District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. Harold Entz, Jr.
F87-78198-KM