judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00642-CV
14-89-00642-CV
07/11/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
The Chase Manhatten Bank, N.A.
Harmon, Melinda, Judge, 280th District Court, Harris, Et Al
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/21/1990Case stored
05/02/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
04/04/1990Opinion issuedGRANTED
04/04/1990Opinion Withdrawn
02/28/1990Opinion issuedGRANTED
09/21/1989Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
09/21/1989Mtn.Lv. oral argument DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STADENIED
09/14/1989Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
09/14/1989Mtn.Lv. oral argument FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
08/31/1989Motion to abate DISPOSED - APP, STADENIED
08/31/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
08/31/1989Opinion issuedDENIED
08/31/1989Opinion issuedDENIED
08/03/1989Motion to abate FILED - APP, STA
08/03/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
07/27/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
07/27/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
07/18/1989Mtn.ext.time file response DISPOSED-ANT,APE,GRANTED
07/18/1989Mtn.ext.time file response DISPOSED-ANT,APE,GRANTED
07/17/1989Motion to extend time to file response FILED
07/11/1989Court's request for a response
07/11/1989Exhibits received
07/11/1989Exhibits received
07/11/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
07/11/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJoe H. Reynolds
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 280th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorPatricia B. Lehtola
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
88-33639