judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00210-CV
11-89-00210-CV
07/11/1989
Contract
Stewart Title Company, a Texas Corporation
Gulf Freeway Joint Venture #1
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/1991Case returned from higher court
10/02/1991Mandate issued
09/05/1991Application for writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/12/1991Express fee paid
04/09/1991Case forwarded to higher court
03/26/1991Application fee paid
03/26/1991Application for writ of error
03/26/1991Express fee received
03/20/1991Case forwarded to higher court
03/14/1991Application fee paid
03/14/1991Express fee paid
03/14/1991Application for writ of error
02/14/1991Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
02/14/1991Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
01/22/1991Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
01/17/1991Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/1991Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
01/07/1991Mot. - For rehearing filed
01/07/1991Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH
01/07/1991Motion for rehearing received - not filed
12/21/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
12/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/21/1990Submitted
05/21/1990Submission set in Eastland
05/18/1990Supp. brief filed
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gulf Freeway Joint VentureAppelleeLeonard J. Meyer
Gulf Freeway Joint Venture #1AppelleeTed D. Meyer
G. Scott Williams
Stewart Title Company, A TexasAppellantEugene J. Pitman
Susan J. Taylor
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
84-43097