judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAIGE (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33446
Short Caption:PAIGE (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C150109Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/20/2000 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/20/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/10/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/10/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00313
12/14/1998TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: Jury Trial--9/3/98 and 9/4/98. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 98-00377
01/05/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: January 11, 1999. 99-00027
01/19/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Mailed on: express mail-no postmark. 99-00360
01/19/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. To-wit: 13 pages. Mailed on: express mail-no postmark. 99-00361
01/27/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Time for filing fast track statement in excess of 10 pages and appendix received January 19, 1999, shall be filed forthwith. 99-00556
01/27/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00364
01/27/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-00366
02/16/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01028
02/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days after the date of this order. Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. fn2 [We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal.] 99-01324
04/09/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-02708
05/10/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-03728
06/09/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 9, 1999. 99-04872
07/15/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-06331
07/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion filed July 15, 1999, is granted. The reply brie provisionally submitted on July 15, 1999, shall be filed forthwith. 99-06511
07/20/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. 99-06332
11/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 20, 2000 at the hour of 2:30 p.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(NNP99B-CY, DA, ML)
12/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Rescheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is rescheduled for January 20, 2000 at the hour of 2:00 p.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(NNP99B-CY, DA,ML) 99-13046
01/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-00207
01/20/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Oral Argument before the Northern Nevada Panel: submitted. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
02/24/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed." Before Young, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 21. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-02907
03/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-04458
03/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/18/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 10, 2000. 00-04458