judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RIPP CAUSEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0145)
Case Number:S-08-0145Case Docketed On:07/07/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Niobrara CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RIPP CAUSEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RIPP CAUSEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRipp CauseyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Self Defense
Opinion Number:2009 WY 111
Citation:215 P.3d 287

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/07/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/15/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from appellant's mother requesting copy of opinion when issued. Address is in case notes.EventPhone CallFinal
08/25/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
09/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received notice of additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/01/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/29/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, presentence investigation; Volumes IV-V, transcripts; Volume VI, exhibit (vhs tape).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/04/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/18/2009Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
09/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petition and Brief for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2009Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
09/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal