judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEYONE JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1308
Short Caption:KEYONE JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-27530-08Filed Date:10/18/2010

Opening Event Date:10/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/18/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/20/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKeyone Jackson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Angela G. Schmidt YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Lisa D. Chanel, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
11/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Lisa D. Chanel, Esquire
12/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT Ordered/Needed (pii))
12/06/2010NOTICE SENT- to attorney re: signature needed on statement
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (12 pgs/tape) 3/13/09 proc.
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (18 pgs/Richer) 7/28/09 proc.
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (125 pgs/Hamilton) 5/14/10 proc.
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (45 pgs/Maddox) 5/21/10 proc.
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (7 pgs/tape) 7/23/10 proc.
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (22 pgs/tape) 10/6/10 proc. w/cd
01/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/25/2011FiledRECORD INDEX (SEALED, See order dated 5/12/11)
01/25/2011FiledRECORD COPIES (SEALED, See order dated 5/12/11)
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to April 4, 2011 (no oppo/nunc pro tunc).
03/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 4, 2011. (JAC)
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 20 days. no oppo
04/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 16, 2011 (no oppo)
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SEAL RECORD no oppo (filed under seal)
05/02/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/DVD. -- no oppo (filed under seal)
05/02/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appdx.
05/12/2011ORDERED that appellant's motion to seal is granted and the Clerk shall seal the complete record on appeal. F/O that appellant's motion to supplement the record is granted and the lodged DVD's and documents will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for transmittal to this court as supplemental records under seal. F/O that appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted to the extent that the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix. F/O that the appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
05/12/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/12/2011APPENDIX
05/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (voluntary statement, ect--w/4 disc--SEALED)
06/09/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/28/11 no oppo
06/15/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 28, 2011. (JAC)
07/28/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)
07/28/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion to supplement the record with the lodged documents.
08/18/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (SEALED pleading)
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file lodged reply brief.
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/18/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Thompson, Belson
02/22/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
03/07/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File for rehearing Other (Appellant)Granted
03/07/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
03/20/2012FiledMandate
04/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 4/22/12.