judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00197-CV
11-89-00197-CV
07/11/1989
Other Personal Injury
Cestro, Doris, Individually & as Rep. of Mark Johnson Estate
Medina, M.D., Matias
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/1990Mandate issued
04/09/1990Mot. on extension f time disposed in Sup. Crt.Overruled
01/18/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposed
01/18/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
01/11/1990Mot. - To file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/1990Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article
12/27/1989Mot. - For rehearing filed
12/27/1989Motion for rehearing received - not filed
12/07/1989Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH
10/20/1989Supp. brief filed
10/19/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/19/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/19/1989Opinion issued
10/02/1989Submitted
10/02/1989Miscellaneous filing
10/02/1989Submission set in Eastland
09/25/1989Phone call - we receive from lawyers, etc.
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cestro, Doris Etc.Appellant
Medina, M.D., MatiasAppellee
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
Honorable Reagan Cartwright
86-05509