judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00196-CV
11-89-00196-CV
07/11/1989
Wills & Estates
Roeske, Orgnet
Borden, Jean et al
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1990Mandate issued
04/19/1990Opinion issued
04/19/1990Opinion issued
04/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/03/1989Submitted
10/03/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Borden, Jean Et AlAppelleeSteven K. Ward
Roeske, OrgnetAppellantWendell S. Loomis
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No. 3
Harris
201,450