judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00192-CV
11-89-00192-CV
07/11/1989
Divorce
Ward, Kenneth Randall
Ward, Emily Snow
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/05/1990Mandate issued
01/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed/ Reversed & Remanded
01/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed/ Reversed & Remanded
01/11/1990Opinion issued
10/03/1989Submitted
10/03/1989Submission set in Eastland
09/28/1989Phone call - we receive from lawyers, etc.
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ward, Emily SnowAppellee
Ward, Kenneth RandallAppellantJohn R. Froeschner
Trial Court Information
306th District Court
Galveston
Honorable Andrew Baker
28,914