judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00191-CR
11-89-00191-CR
07/11/1989
Robbery
Winfrey, Hilton
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/22/1990Case returned from higher court
02/22/1990Mandate issued
01/24/1990Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposedRefused
12/04/1989Case forwarded to higher court
11/27/1989Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case
10/26/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/02/1989Submitted
10/02/1989Submission set in Eastland
09/08/1989Letter filed from . . .
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
509,153
30 yrs/$10,000 fine