judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00212-CR
11-89-00212-CR
07/11/1989
Other Drug Possession
Van Dyke, Curtiss
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/22/1991Mandate issued
01/10/1991Miscellaneous motion disposedMotion dismissed as moot
12/21/1990Miscellaneous motion filed
11/29/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/19/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH
10/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
01/11/1990Motion requesting oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/11/1990Case reinstated
01/11/1990Mot. - To file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/11/1990Case ready to be set
01/11/1990Order entered
01/11/1990Former opinion withdrawn
01/11/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/11/1990Case reinstated
01/09/1990Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article
01/03/1990Motion requesting oral argument filed
01/03/1990Motion for rehearing received - not filed
01/03/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
12/14/1989Submitted
12/14/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/22/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Van Dyke, CurtissCriminal - AppellantJoseph J. Finkel
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable Robert N. Burdette, Judge
482,825
2 yrs. TDC