judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00207-CR
11-89-00207-CR
07/11/1989
Other Felony
James, Byron Daird
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/1990Mandate issued
08/21/1990Inquiring on status, etc. of case
08/21/1990Inquiring on status, etc. of case
06/07/1990Motion to stay disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/1990Case returned from higher court
05/30/1990Motion to stay mandate
05/09/1990Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposedRefused
03/06/1990Case forwarded to higher court
03/01/1990Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case
01/12/1990Mot. on extension of time disposed in CCAMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/1990We send letter to lawyers, etc.
12/14/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/02/1989Submitted
10/02/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No. 6
Harris
Honorable Jack Robert Musslewhite
8837836
1 yr probated