judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00203-CV
11-89-00203-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Vega, Ted
The Rectorseal Corporation
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/29/1990Mandate issued
06/26/1990Case returned from higher court
06/25/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
05/09/1990Application for writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/21/1990Case forwarded to higher court
03/19/1990Express fee paid
03/19/1990Application fee paid
03/19/1990Application for writ of error
02/15/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
02/02/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
01/25/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH
12/28/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/01/1989Supp. brief filed
10/16/1989Supp. brief filed
10/04/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rector Seal CorporationAppelleeMichael S. Hays
Vega, TedAppellantWilliam R. Laughlin
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
86-01774